Trustees ROWNER COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1068666

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JOHN WILLIAM HOUGHTON | Chair | 08 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brown | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Alicja Byer | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart McIndoe | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN GEORGE LYCETT | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.