Cambridge Hindu Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHA promotes and organises events for the advancement of Indian Culture, Dance, Music and Religions. It works with non-government, government, community groups and education institutes. It also runs elders club so as to keep them active and provides meeting place for socialising. Regular lectures and talks are arranged on topics to keep the community informed on topical issues. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 October 1999: Standard registration
- I. C. A. (CAMBRIDGE) (Working name)
- ICA (Working name)
- ICCA (Working name)
- INDIAN COMMUNITY AND CULTURE ASSOCIATION, CAMBRIDGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bankimchandra Oad | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheetal Chavva | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ketan Kanubhai Chauhan | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.26k | £3.74k | £10.06k | £8.84k | £6.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £1.25k | £2.30k | £4.62k | £6.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 June 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2011 as amended on 14 May 2022 as amended on 14 May 2022
Charitable objects
I) FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF CAMBRIDGE TO PROVIDE, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS; AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, GENDER, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN DOING SO TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SAID COMMUNITY CENTRE (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY ) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES. II) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE RELIGIONS OF INDIA AND IN PARTICULAR HINDU RELIGION. IN HISTORY, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF INDIA AND IN RELATED OR OTHER SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Peacock Drive
Bottisham
CAMBRIDGE
CB25 9EF
- Phone:
- 07905802498
- Email:
- thakpatel@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window