THE SEDGEFORD HISTORICAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SHARP is a long-term, multi-period, multi-disciplinary independent research project set up to investigate the entire range of human settlement and land use in a typical north-west Norfolk parish, from the earliest times to the present day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 September 1997: Standard registration
- SHARP (Working name)
- THE SEDGEFORD HISTORICAL AND ARCHAELOGICAL RESEARCH PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Koster | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Lees | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pete Taylor | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMILY ANTIGONE HARRIS | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HORN | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL COCKLING | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Baxter | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
OWEN CHRISTOPHER MORGAN | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
GARETH JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA KATRINA HELEN ATKINS | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELEANOR BLAKELOCK | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Bolton-Smith | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.76k | £14.67k | £36.11k | £65.20k | £46.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.10k | £10.73k | £28.59k | £65.86k | £33.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 March 2023
(These accounts |
24 June 2024 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUG 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND CONSERVATION BY PROMOTING, UNDERTAKING AND MAKING PUBLIC HISTORICAL RESEARCH AND ARCHEOLOGICAL INVESTIGATION INTO THE LANDSCAPE OF THE PARISH OF SEDGEFORD IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND OF ADJOINING AND NEIGHBOURING PARISHES (HEREINAFTER TOGETHER REFERRED TO AS "THE RESEARCH AREA"). THE RESULTS OF THE WORK WILL DISSEMINATED BY PUBLICATIONS, EXHIBITIONS, PUBLIC LECTURES AND OTHER MEANS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Nightingale Walk
Denver
Downham Market
PE38 0DS
- Phone:
- 07759402298
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window