Financial history THE JAMES HILL MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1065958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £132 £133 £213 £500 £888
Total expenditure £234 £1.54k £1.83k £2.35k £1.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A