SHANTI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1064813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes donations. Funding/grants are usually only made to needs and contacts based in Yorkshire and North East England who are personally known to the trustees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £18,022
Total expenditure: £60,646

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE SHANTI CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Robert Gill Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
ANDREW JOHN GILL Trustee 07 December 2011
None on record
ROSS KEVIN HYETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.72k £3.11k £1.68k £12.52k £18.02k
Total expenditure £36.32k £5.17k £29.52k £41.00k £60.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 July 2024 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 15 February 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mr A J Gill
12 Comfrey
Coulby Newham
Middlesbrough
TS8 0XT
Phone:
01132855000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available