HEREFORDSHIRE ORNITHOLOGICAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Garden birdwatch and monthly censuses at major sites. 2) Indoor meetings with expert speakers and illustrated talks. 3) Field meetings visiting Herefordshire's best birding sites & further a field with expert leaders. 4) Publish 'HOC News' quarterly & Annual bird report. 5) Run website with latest news, sightings & pictures. 6) Undertake surveys and encourage members to report all sightings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 13 March 1998: Standard registration
- HOC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Greenwood | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Selena Jane Chambers | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Peter Coney | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Robinson | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Longmore | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Pullen | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Jones | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Grunsell | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terry Downes | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Eric Bound | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN QUINN | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Hugh Davies | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Colquhoun | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £5.14k | £56.42k | £5.55k | £5.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.93k | £5.50k | £10.03k | £5.63k | £10.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2012 as amended on 14 Mar 2019 as amended on 10 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY OF WILD BIRDS, THEIR HABITATS AND THEIR CONSERVATION IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE. 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN SUCH ASPECTS AND TO PUBLICISE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Bodenham Road
HEREFORD
HR1 2TS
- Phone:
- 07852 834869
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window