Governing document HEREFORDSHIRE ORNITHOLOGICAL CLUB

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2012 as amended on 14 Mar 2019 as amended on 10 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY OF WILD BIRDS, THEIR HABITATS AND THEIR CONSERVATION IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE. 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN SUCH ASPECTS AND TO PUBLICISE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.