TOTON COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for school activities not provided by the authority school budget.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 October 1997: Standard registration
- 20 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TOTON BISPHAM DRIVE JUNIOR SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.89k | £17.68k | £14.42k | £10.76k | £13.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.81k | £25.10k | £17.16k | £10.90k | £11.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF TOTON COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window