SOHO CHILD 2000

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY USES ITS INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF SOHO PARISH SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 17 September 1997: Standard registration
- SOHO CHILD (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LUCY WINKETT | Chair | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Louise Helen Ritchie | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STUART PINSKER | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Bancroft | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.96k | £3.96k | £4.31k | £4.71k | £4.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.16k | £3.06k | £96 | £8.48k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 27TH AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN SOHO PARISH SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 ROAN STREET
GREENWICH
LONDON
SE10 9JT
- Phone:
- 02088584981
- Email:
- RICHARD@BANCROFT.UK.NET
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window