AFRICAN SWAHILI COMMUNITY PROJECT IN THE U.K
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice on welfare rights, supporting and counselling on immigration, housing, employment and training, health, education, participating in activities in conjunction with other agencies and organisations dealing with asylum seekers & refugees, organising events such as health promotion, party for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 1997: Standard registration
- 13 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- A.S.C.O.P. (Working name)
- UNDUGU (Working name)
- AFRICAN SWAHILIPHONE REFUGEE PROJECT IN THE U.K (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.69k | £21.57k | £29.90k | £13.98k | £10.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.91k | £22.77k | £26.18k | £16.59k | £12.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 28 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, AMONGST IMMIGRANTS OF AFRICAN DESCENT FROM SWAHILI SPEAKING REGIONS, INCLUDING GREAT LAKES REGION AND EAST AFRICA, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ADVOCACY, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT, HEALTH, HOUSING, IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBTS, SOCIAL SECURITY, TRAINING, WELFARE AND WORKFARE. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH A VIEW OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (C) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT AND TO ADVANCE TRAINING, HEALTH AND CULTURE WITHIN AND AMONG THE AFRICAN IMMIGRANT COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (D) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CULTURE, EDUCATION AND HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN THE GREAT LAKES REGION AND EAST AFRICA. (E) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN REASON OF NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROTECT THE YOUTH TEMPORARILY OR DEFINITELY DEPRIVED OF HIS FAMILY ENVIRONMENT AND TO ENCOURAGE WOMEN TO ASSUME MORE RESPONSIBILITIES IN SOCIAL LIFE AS A TRUE DEVELOPMENT AGENT. (F) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE SWAHILI SPEAKING COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (C) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window