PERSIA EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the cause of education, conduct projects promoting knowledge and training in education, health, freedom from violence, especially among women and children; offer scholarships; and collaborate with like-minded organisations focussed on education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 1997: Standard registration
- PEDAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hossein Alexander Fatemi | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Hashemi | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Nina Ansary | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Parviz Mina | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alimohammad Seifpour Fatemi | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dori Dana-Haeri | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nazenin Ansari Moshiri | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mohammadreza Ansari | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.92k | £35.19k | £25.92k | £43.75k | £125.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.85k | £19.30k | £18.46k | £38.63k | £90.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO BENEFIT STUDENTS OF IRANIAN NATIONALITY OR IRANIAN DESCENT REGISTERED FOR FULL TIME STUDIES AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE OF FURTHER EDUCATION, TECHNICAL COLLEGE, OR POLYTECHNIC OUTSIDE OF IRAN IN THE FINAL PENULTIMATE YEAR OF THEIR STUDIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO COMPLETE THEIR COURSE. (2) TO MAKE GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS OR INSTITUTIONS TO FINANCE EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH RELATING TO IRAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Calico Row
Plantation Wharf
Battersea
SW11 3YH
- Phone:
- 02078010118
- Email:
- info@persia.education
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window