THE LENCHES SPORTS AND RECREATION CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provides sporting and recreational facilities to the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,086 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 March 1998: Standard registration
- THE LENCHES SPORTS CLUB (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Hazelwood | Chair | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||
NEIL ROBERT DANIEL PEARCE | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT MARCUS PERKINS | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NATHANIEL JAMES BURTON | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Patrick Twist | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Francis Johnson | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex William Enstone | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JEAN ROBERTS | Trustee | 24 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD YORKE BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.81k | £32.06k | £33.67k | £131.56k | £110.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.51k | £26.95k | £49.70k | £40.92k | £38.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.04k | £8.00k | £19.00k | £29.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
07 August 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 31 JULY 1997. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 MARCH 1998. as amended on 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITHIN THE LENCHES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL, SOCCER, TENNIS, CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS SO AS TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS.
Area of benefit
THE LENCHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PAVILION
The Lenches Club
Ab Lench Road
Church Lench
EVESHAM
WR11 4UQ
- Phone:
- 01386442566
- Email:
- lsrc.lenches@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window