AFRICAN FRANCOPHONE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Social gathering to relieve isolation and distress, to discuss issues in the community and find ways forward. -Sports events - coaching young people in the community in football and playing friendly matches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 1998: Standard registration
- AFCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KONA KATEMBWE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BOMPER BONONO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BECKY MUHIMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £2.40k | £1.80k | £8.01k | £5.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £2.39k | £1.79k | £8.01k | £5.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 26 JULY 1997, AS AMENDED 25 NOVEMBER 1997 AND 23 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
[1] THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG THE AFRICAN FRANCOPHONE COMMUNITY AND REFUGEES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND ASSISTANCE IN OBTAINING GRANTS BENEFITS AND HOUSING. [2] THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITY; IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING. AMONG THOSE SUFFERING FROM SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES IN ACCESSING HEALTH SERVICES AND EDUCATION ABOUT SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES. [3] THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ADULTS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ABOUT ENGLISH COURSES AND INTERPRETATION AND OTHER SERVICES TO IMPROVE COMMUNICATION WITH SCHOOLS AND EDUCATION AUTHORITIES. [4] THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, ESPECIALLY IN THE DIASPORA'S COUNTRIES OF ORIGIN BY RUNNING CHARITABLE DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES AND EXCHANGE EXPERIENCES WITH LOCAL NON GOVERNMENTAL ORGANIZATIONS BY MEANS OF EDUCATION, HEALTH, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC EMPOWERMENT PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, EUROPE, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 PRETORIA ROAD
TOTTENHAM
LONDON
N17 8EB
- Phone:
- 07983616651
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window