ST PAULS YOUTH ENSEMBLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orchestral playing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 29 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sabine Rondet | Chair | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ledgerwood | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mallo Martinez | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iwona Sutton | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Armelle Tardiveau | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Martin | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.22k | £10.19k | £1.92k | £10.82k | £12.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.89k | £8.54k | £3.30k | £9.51k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 June 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED 22 NOVEMBER 1997 as amended on 08 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
To advance musical education and in particular the education and training of young musicians in orchestral playing and chamber music through the formation of a symphony orchestra or orchestras and/or a chamber group or groups
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 MOORSIDE SOUTH
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 9BD
- Phone:
- 07792990827
- Email:
- stpaulsye@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window