ELMER AND FRIENDS PLACE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 July 1998: Standard registration
- 07 March 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ELMER'S PLACE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.89k | £82.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.89k | £78.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL AMENDED 27 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) ENHANCE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND TO PROVIDE FOR THEIR CHILDREN (B) PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window