Financial history LEICESTER FAMILY CONTACT CENTRE

Charity Number: 1074902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.68k £2.79k £3.27k £3.10k £3.47k
Total expenditure £2.95k £3.88k £3.26k £2.96k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A