CORBY FURNITURE TURNAROUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Corby Furniture Turnaround is a voluntary organisation committed to collecting donated furniture and delivering it to people on low income. We provide workplace skills, training and friendship to volunteers who help provide the service, often leading to qualifications and employment opportunities. We also help the environment by reducing the amount of household goods ending up in landfill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £3,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 02 October 1997: Standard registration
- 08 August 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- FURNITURE TURNAROUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.09k | £72.37k | £76.98k | £77.86k | £88.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.68k | £89.38k | £93.51k | £94.63k | £92.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.51k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 02 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 09 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 01 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 12 November 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 21ST JUNE 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, ANY PERSONS RESIDENT IN CORBY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO IS IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE, OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES AND/OR SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window