Accounts and annual returns NETWORK PARTNERS

Charity number: 1070987
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 28 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 18 February 2016 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 11 May 2015 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required