Trustees LITTLE OAKS PRE-SCHOOL-STOKE FERRY
Charity Number: 1068134

Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Smith | Chair | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Chan | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harrison | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Needs | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Clarkson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lara Evans | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Whistler | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.