LANCASTER STEINER SCHOOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education/training: The schools vision aims to help children have a full experience of childhood that can nourish and develop their innate capabilities, so that they become responsible, free individuals who think clearly, observe perceptively and act considerately.We encourage children to become independent and capable learners. This develops their innate capacities for wonder and imagination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 December 1997: Standard registration
- LANCASTER STEINER EDUCATION PROJECT (Working name)
- LANCASTER STEINER RAINBOW PARENT & TODDLER GROUP (Working name)
- LANCASTER STEINER RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- LANCASTER STEINER SCHOOL (Working name)
- CHERRYTREES KINDERGARTEN (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maialen Galarraga Gallastegui | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella Cani | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shabnam Afroze Cadwallender | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David John Barton | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.47k | £127.00k | £165.65k | £151.11k | £144.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.30k | £112.72k | £151.51k | £173.21k | £149.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £135 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.42k | £13.18k | £37.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2022 | 233 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION UPON THE PRINCIPALS INDICATED BY THE LATE DR RUDOLF STEINER AND TO CONDUCT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN 2) TO ESTABLISH AND CARRY ON A SCHOOL WHERE PUPILS, SCHOLARS AND STUDENTS MAY OBTAIN ON MODERATE TERMS A SOUND GENERAL EDUCATION UPON THE PRINCIPLES INDICATED BY RUDOLF STEINER. 3) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF ALL OR SUCH OF THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, INCLUDING THE ART OF EURYTHMY AS ARE NECESSARY
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
LUNE ROAD
Lancaster
LA1 5QU
- Phone:
- 01524381876
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window