DIVI SEEMA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance to others engaged in alleviating poverty in south India; providing interest free loans for people to acquire assets and skills for income generating activates, supporting savings groups,members of which have access to free nursery school places for their children and subsidised medical care, funding training courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- India
Governance
- 29 December 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nancy Winchester | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
DR peter john winchester | Trustee | 17 December 1997 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JOHN LOURIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Peter Ronald Lionel Alcock | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £856 | £1.03k | £780 | £1.20k | £350 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.00k | £1 | £550 | £350 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS IN POOR AND LANDLESS HOUSEHOLDS IN THE KRISHNA REGION OF INDIA, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF LOANS AND GRANTS TO, AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF SAVINGS GROUPS FUNDED BY, THE WOMEN OF THOSE HOUSEHOLDS
Area of benefit
KRISHNA AREA OF INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 WARNBOROUGH ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6JA
- Phone:
- 01865557600
- Email:
- winchesterpeter@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window