NIAT - NATIONAL INTER-ACTION TRUST LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the charity is to promote, maintain and develop education within the area of I.T. This is done primarily through the eDCC assessment scheme which awards certificates of achievement to learners of all ages and abilities. On 27 October 2011 the eDCC scheme was transferred to The Princes Trust and the charity did not undertake any new business.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 October 1998: Standard registration
- 06 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.24k | £93.59k | £94.74k | £102.86k | £73.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.73k | £86.34k | £156.45k | £182.18k | £90.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 25 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 25 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 21 December 2011 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 21 December 2011 | 51 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 17 September 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5TH SEPTEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF: (I) EDUCATION AND TRAINING THAT WILL ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS TO SEEK AND OBTAIN USEFUL SKILLS AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR WORK OR LEISURE TIME, AND, (II) EDUCATION, DRAMA AND OTHER FINE ARTS AND MEDIA, ESPECIALLY THOSE ACTIVITIES WHICH SEEK TO MAKE THE ARTS AND MEDIA RELEVANT TO THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DRAMATIC IMPROVISATION, LITERATURE, DANCE, SINGING, COMPUTING, VIDEO, PHOTOGRAPHY, SOUND RECORDING, FILM MAKING AND MUSIC; AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR. B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED BEING PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES PROVIDED THAT NEVERTHELESS SUCH FACILITIES SHALL BE AVAILABLE TO THE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. C) TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OR AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF A MUSEUM, CENTRE AND/OR ANY CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS WHICH CARRY ON THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO SUBSCRIBE OR GUARANTEE MONEY IN CONNECTION THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window