Accounts and annual returns STANWELL OVER 50'S

Charity number: 1065416
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 22 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 22 August 2013 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 August 2013 569 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 22 August 2013 934 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required