THE DARLINGTON PIANO SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society organises a season of classical piano music concerts by International Artists from October to Easter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Durham
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 14 March 1998: Standard registration
- DARLINGTON PIANO SOCIETY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREGORY WILLIAM JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER ANTHONY WEBSTER | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Edwards | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MORRELL SWIFT | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £1.99k | £14.71k | £6.29k | £10.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65k | £183 | £12.69k | £11.08k | £10.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 1997 as amended on 20 Feb 2022 as amended on 20 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, SPECIFICALLY OF PIANO, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC RECITALS: AND FOR THE GENERALLY PURPOSE OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 PIERREMONT CRESCENT
DARLINGTON
DL3 9PA
- Phone:
- 07730870589
- Email:
- gregwj1949@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window