North Atlantic Salmon Fund (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principle activities are to protect, conserve and enhance stocks of North Atlantic salmon and seatrout for the public benefit. The main activity is to reduce the amount of netting at sea of mixed stocks of fish returning to the United Kingdom to spawn. The charity is actively involved in the purchase of drift netting operations with a view to their elimination or reduction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 February 1998: Standard registration
- THE MIGRATORY SALMON FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOM SILK | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Arden | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SLOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.42k | £2.70k | £2.75k | £2.75k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £41.84k | £2.23k | £2.23k | £5.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH JANUARY 1998 as amended on 11 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
ANY PURPOSES WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROTECTING, CONSERVING AND ENHANCING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE UNITED KINGDOM STOCKS OF NORTH ATLANTIC SALMON AND SEA TROUT, INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF ALL MATTERS CONNECTED THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 VOLTAIRE ROAD
LONDON
SW4 6DF
- Phone:
- 02076224063
- Email:
- j.simpkiss@btclick.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window