"LOOK" LONDON LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our sole focus is to support the families / carers of children and young people with visual impairment (VI), who live within the Greater London area. This can include liaison with social workers, health and education professionals as well as voluntary staff working with VI children and young people and their families / carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 October 1997: Standard registration
- 07 September 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LOOK LONDON (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.05k | £10.26k | £2.65k | £31.52k | £9.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.77k | £27.65k | £28.34k | £34.18k | £9.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 09 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 26 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 09 August 2009 | 375 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 09 December 2008 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 17 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 23 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 22 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 22 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 28 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 28 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE -TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THE PURPOSES OF PROMOTING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL; WELFARE THE SPIRITUAL , SOCIAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN GREATER LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window