Financial history SURESTART

Charity number: 1064759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £286.57k £290.26k £279.72k £263.37k £299.16k
Total expenditure £285.05k £247.14k £247.76k £280.22k £284.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A