Financial history CARELINE

Charity number: 1068801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.38k £90.20k £11.36k £29.30k £86.84k
Total expenditure £49.50k £39.16k £59.32k £49.63k £61.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.96k £54.62k £2.01k £2.01k £2.01k