THE STANLEY COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make grants to Charitable Organisations for general charitable purposes. Please note Grants will only be considered to Charities whose average fund raising costs do not exceed 25% of funds raised (based on last 2 years audited accounts).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHELLEY MARIE MORRIS | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
DANIEL JAMES RUBIN | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rubin | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cohen | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | £0 | £35.63k | £32.54k | £12.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.28k | £95.08k | £125.25k | £129.96k | £724.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH MARCH 1997 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOOD HALL
WOODHALL LANE
SHENLEY
RADLETT
WD7 9AY
- Phone:
- 01923289999
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window