PLYMOUTH YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION - YMCA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through targeted health and well being activities, accommodation, training and education, family work and support and advice services we actively look for opportunities to make a transformable impact on young peoples lives. In so doing we will provide safe environments that inspire and nurture body, mind and spirit and enable young people to play an active role in their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,628,774
Donations and legacies | £63.17k | |
Charitable activities | £1.52m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.25k | |
Other | £42.51k |
Total expenditure:
£1,664,932
Raising funds | £16.72k | |
Charitable activities | £1.65m | |
Other | £0 |
-£76 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £456,259 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £16.72k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.65m |
People

51 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 10 December 1998: Standard registration
- YMCA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vic Hibbert | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
William John Bale | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Barton Coates | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Astra Bassett | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Tytherleigh | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Anthony Bennett | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lawrence Braschi | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Robert Sleet | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE MARIE STONE | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY HART | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Greenwood | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arash Dinari | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME CHARLES CATLING | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43m | £1.42m | £1.64m | £2.45m | £1.63m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49m | £1.30m | £1.58m | £1.69m | £1.66m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £180.59k | £169.80k | £282.96k | £285.87k | £456.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.43k | £63.49k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £71.41k | £545.76k | £493.40k | £1.09m | £63.17k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £936 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.34m | £876.36k | £1.15m | £1.36m | £1.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £234 | £209 | £224 | £272 | £1.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £11.44k | £0 | £4.00k | £0 | £42.51k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £921.92k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.47m | £1.29m | £1.56m | £1.67m | £1.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.58k | £10.80k | £21.44k | £16.24k | £16.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £56.37k | £20.57k | £30.52k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.18m | £2.10m | £2.89m | £3.06m | £2.99m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.15k | £4.08k | |
|
Other assets | £122.83k | £680.23k | £82.94k | £76.32k | £168.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£129.79k | £0 | -£60.87k | -£155.07k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £548.51k | £1.03m | £1.17m | £414.82k | £627.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION GIVEN 28 AUGUST 1997 ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JULY 2010. ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE CONDITIONS OF NEED, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THEIR RELIEF. TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
PLYMOUTH
Linked charities
- 10 December 1998 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ymca
Honicknowle Lane
PLYMOUTH
PL5 3NG
- Phone:
- 01752201915
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window