Financial history NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE DISABILITY SPORTS FORUM

Charity Number: 1069850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.29k £416 £241 £1.46k £1.76k
Total expenditure £3.03k £30 £89 £3.03k £2.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A