Financial history YOUTH CANCER TRUST (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1064736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £189.88k £103.00k £101.94k £182.95k £238.96k
Total expenditure £259.80k £221.00k £250.09k £302.87k £282.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £63.72k N/A N/A N/A