CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANFARIAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CYLCH MEITHRIN PROVIDING NURSERY EDUCATION THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,920 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 21 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jade-Leigh Evans | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.96k | £66.73k | £40.79k | £61.41k | £84.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.48k | £51.55k | £43.63k | £59.38k | £68.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £5.38k | £9.57k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.35k | £46.34k | N/A | £2.33k | £6.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 309 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2023 | 674 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2023 | 1039 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL GYNRADD LLANFARIAN
LLANFARIAN
ABERYSTWYTH
CEREDIGION
SY23 4DN
- Phone:
- 01970612664
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window