THE SOAR PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Resource to schools taking lessons and assemblies. Resource to Churches taking services and enabling Holiday Clubs. Also providing workshops, after school activities and seasonal events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 February 1998: Standard registration
- SOAR (Working name)
- THE SCHOOLS OUTREACH AND RESOURCES PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Julie Payne | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Whitehead | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Susan Willetts | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Paul Wearn | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ANDREW ROSE | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.17k | £58.54k | £42.67k | £64.44k | £58.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.50k | £43.74k | £51.27k | £58.21k | £64.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £700 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 1997 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 31 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND OR ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ANYWAY WHICH THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO SUPPORT THE PREACHING AND TEACHING MINISTRY OF EVANGELISTS TO PRODUCE AND DISTRIBUTE CHRISTIAN LITERATURE AND TAPE AND VIDEO RECORDINGS TO PROMOTE THE USE OF CHRISTIAN MUSIC THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS BEING CHARITABLE AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCTIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND OR ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Howard Close
Loughborough
LE11 4TI
- Phone:
- 01509238850
- Email:
- office@soarproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window