Financial history GROSVENOR LIGHT OPERA COMPANY

Charity number: 1065719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £24.51k £20.97k £3.23k £29.44k £29.75k
Total expenditure £22.44k £9.52k £1.64k £40.48k £25.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A