THE BLACKROCK (UK) CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There has been no activity over the past year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 November 1997: Standard registration
- 26 April 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE MERCURY ASSET MANAGEMENT CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE MERRILL LYNCH INVESTM INVESTMENT MANAGERS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE MERRILL LYNCH INVESTMENT MANAGERS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.38k | £1.75k | £1.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.97k | £2.98k | £1.30k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 15 November 2016 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1997 AND 15 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window