Financial history WATERHOUSES (DURHAM) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.82k £29.77k £17.82k £15.33k £26.30k
Total expenditure £23.43k £24.22k £25.52k £21.64k £28.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.24k £8.80k £1.00k £600