WATERHOUSES (DURHAM) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run and maintain The Village Hall. Provide social, leisure and educational activities for all ages and capabilities. Run fundraising events. Improve quality of life and the environment for residents and those of surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 20 October 1997: Standard registration
- WATERHOUSES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION W. C. A. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terri Hosler | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Stefan Gemski | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Gemski | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA COLLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.82k | £29.77k | £17.82k | £15.33k | £26.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.43k | £24.22k | £25.52k | £21.64k | £28.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.24k | £8.80k | £1.00k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 April 2022 | 84 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 30 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION SOCIAL WELFARE AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS 2) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE 3) OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
WATERHOUSE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waterhouses Community Association
Village Hall
Station Street
Waterhouses
DURHAM
DH7 9AS
- Phone:
- 01913739113
- Email:
- office@waterhouses.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window