Trustees Friends of Ewell Grove
Charity Number: 1064755

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Elizabeth Dickson | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Tracy Ann Danaswamy | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Emma Powell | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paula Rising | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Matthew Hilton | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Christie | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Ann Whittle | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liza Monaghan | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lerryn Elizabeth Reynoldson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kellea Jayne York | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Slater | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Farah Sadrudin Habib Shah | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.