Financial history THE AK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1065046
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £305 £273 £216 £234 £104
Total expenditure £0 £235 £329 £235 £282
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A