BEER PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIEND'S ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1064777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Primary school Parent Teacher and Friends Association fundraising group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £7,372
Total expenditure: £2,724

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BEER SCHOOL P T F A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Boalch Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.05k £1.84k £5.53k £4.86k £7.37k
Total expenditure £2.31k £310 £1.64k £2.82k £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Beer Primary School
Mare Lane
Beer
SEATON
Devon
EX12 3NB
Phone:
0129722968