Financial history CHRIST FOUNDATION CHURCH

Charity Number: 1065890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.80k £47.22k £42.81k £55.67k £42.54k
Total expenditure £44.89k £30.24k £21.39k £28.39k £38.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A