CHRISTIAN LIFE CENTRE LIVERPOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity holds weekly services for members and the general public in which God is worshipped, the bible explained and people are encouraged to participate. Eveents include a Sunday worship service at 11am and a bible study each Tuesday evening. Use of the internet is being explored for personal discipleship training. We also run a feeding programme for those who are homeless or disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 18 November 1997: Standard registration
- 27 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SALEM NEW LIFE TABERNACLE (Working name)
- SALEM TABERNACLE ASSEMBLY OF GOD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.89k | £22.56k | £14.99k | £1.78k | £782 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.03k | £31.69k | £17.61k | £17.02k | £16.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 03 March 2017 | 489 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25TH JULY 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LIVERPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window