Accounts and annual returns METRO CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1068674
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2006 16 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2005 21 June 2006 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 21 June 2006 136 days late
Annual return 05 April 2004 12 December 2005 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 12 December 2005 310 days late