INSTITUTE FOR INDIAN MOTHER AND CHILD (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising, including child education sponsorship, for the Institute for Indian Mother and Child in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 11 December 1997: Standard registration
- I.I.M.C. (U.K.) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS IVY SILK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rhian Rosario-Couch | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abu Siddique | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ai-Ling Chang | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Ann Horscroft | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY JAMES JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE WILLIAM PORTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.78k | £27.10k | £22.00k | £27.10k | £50.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.16k | £33.16k | £26.00k | £28.02k | £20.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST CONSTITUTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1997 AMENDED ON 13TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR IN WEST BENGAL BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE INSTITUTE FOR THE INDIAN MOTHER AND CHILD.
Area of benefit
WEST BENGAL, INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 OLIVERS CLOSE
POTTEN END
BERKHAMSTED
HP4 2SL
- Phone:
- 01442871937
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window