FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN (SOUTH LAKES)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity invites children from deprived backgrounds to spend one month with host families in the UK. During their stay the children are fed good food and given plenty of fresh air and exercise. The Charity pays for their air fare, all other transport costs and returns them with clothes & a years supply of vitamins. The host families provide accomodation and any required meals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 October 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 30 October 1997: Standard registration
- 11 December 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 11 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1005165 DERIAN HOUSE CHILDRENS HOSPICE
- F. O. C. C. (SOUTH LAKES) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/10/2018 | 06/10/2019 | 06/10/2020 | 06/10/2021 | 06/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2019 | 18 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF THE DISASTER AT CHERNOBYL
Area of benefit
CHERNOBYL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window