Financial history ASSOCIATION FOR BLINDNESS AND LEPROSY ERADICATION

Charity number: 1067010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.09k £33.74k £21.73k £20.60k £14.14k
Total expenditure £15.62k £38.00k £1.04k £39.46k £13.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A