LHA LONDON LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing accommodation in London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£16,581,114
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £15.16m | |
Other trading activities | £242.57k | |
Investments | £1.18m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,858,047
Raising funds | £230.55k | |
Charitable activities | £9.63m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £230.55k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.63m | |
Retained for future use | £6.72m |
People

84 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
833 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 May 1998: Standard registration
- LHA (Working name)
- LONDON HOSTELS ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Conroy | Chair | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nyawade | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Vaughan Tarr | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Sawer | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wyeth | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harkamaljeet Sandhu Shinger | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADAM POOLE | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Frackiewicz | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Petra Green | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE JOHNSON | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.55m | £11.50m | £9.05m | £14.16m | £16.58m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50m | £7.28m | £7.31m | £9.90m | £9.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £571.16k | £249.73k | £62.77k | £270.77k | £242.57k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.80m | £11.03m | £8.69m | £13.52m | £15.16m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £178.86k | £221.63k | £299.16k | £367.63k | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.40m | £7.17m | £7.19m | £9.73m | £9.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £98.76k | £108.38k | £119.37k | £175.45k | £230.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.13k | £27.64k | £37.62k | £36.50k | £347.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £212.07k | £336.95k | £383.83k | £276.81k | £47.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £3.07k | £53.69k | £106.63k | £41.72k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £236.86m | £242.15m | £240.42m | £249.95m | £250.53m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.34m | £16.24m | £24.52m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £24.46m | £8.82m | £4.95m | £33.24m | £38.77m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£52.00k | -£1.29m | -£42.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.04m | £1.53m | £2.08m | £2.92m | £2.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 NOVEMBER 1940, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1997, 14 APRIL 1998 AND 5 SEPTEMBER 2006. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 1 APRIL 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ACQUIRING, ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, MANAGING AND CONDUCTING HOSTELS TO PROVIDE LOW COST LIVING ACCOMMODATION FOR STUDENTS AND WORKING PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS STUDYING OR WORKING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 ECCLESTON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1V 1PG
- Phone:
- 02078341545
- Email:
- tperkins@lhalondon.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window