THE DICKINSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees currently hold a small investment portfolio and have the power the apply income at their discretion for the benefit of the public of the fabric of Cathedral Church of St Andrew in Wells and All Saints church in Kingweston AND any such other charitable purposes as the Trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER EDWARD JENNER JERRAM | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR GILBERT MARTIN | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HAMILTON TOWNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.39k | £417.29k | £383.90k | £404.83k | £413.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.19k | £435.76k | £372.42k | £352.09k | £458.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
1) SUCH PURPOSES CONDUCIVE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE AND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS AFORESAID OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST. ANDREW IN WELLS IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET AND ITS DIOCESE AND ALL SAINTS CHURCH IN KINGWESTON AFORESAID AND INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR RESTORATION PRESERVATION IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE FABRIC OF THE SAID CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST. ANDREW IN WELLS AFORESAID AND THE SAID ALL SAINTS CHURCH IN KINGWESTON AFORESAID AND THEIR RESPECTIVE MONUMENTS FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNITURE STAINED GLASS ORNAMENTS ORGANS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND THEIR RESPECTIVE PRECINCTS AND CHURCHYARDS: AND 2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERCERS
50 New Street
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 2BX
- Phone:
- 01491572138
- Email:
- gbarker@mercerslaw.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window