WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity Number: 1067365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bringing the message of Jesus Christ to the young people of Warrington through Schools work and Church related events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £120,683
Total expenditure: £105,392

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Warrington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • W.Y.F.C. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN LAZARUS Chair
WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Recently registered
Derek Ellison Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
Wendy Gaffney Trustee 01 January 2020
WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Recently registered
SIMON FAWCETT Trustee
WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Recently registered
THE LYMM SANCTUARY HUB LIMITED
Received: On time
Alan Britton Trustee
THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
WARRINGTON YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £118.57k £118.61k £101.99k £101.86k £120.68k
Total expenditure £107.53k £92.65k £121.61k £92.05k £105.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 MASSEY BROOK LANE
LYMM
WA13 0PN
Phone:
07764923705
Website:

wyfc.org.uk